California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1045 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 7, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014
Bill May 13, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014