California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1054 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 23, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014