LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1054
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1054
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1054
Compare Versions
SB1054 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB1054 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1054 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1054 Amended June 23, 2014
SB1054 Amended April 7, 2014
SB1054 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1054 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB1054 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB1054 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1054 Amended June 23, 2014
SB1054 Amended April 7, 2014
SB1054 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare