|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 199, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4293.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 5704.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3339.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|