LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1060
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1060
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1060
Compare Versions
SB1060 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB1060 Enrolled August 6, 2014
SB1060 Amended June 19, 2014
SB1060 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1060 Amended April 23, 2014
SB1060 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1060 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB1060 Enrolled August 6, 2014
SB1060 Amended June 19, 2014
SB1060 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1060 Amended April 23, 2014
SB1060 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare