California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1063 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/06/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1063AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 29, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Block FEBRUARY 18, 2014 An act to add Section 2105.7 to the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1063, as amended, Block. Voter registration: juvenile detention facilities. Under existing law, a person is entitled to register to vote if he or she is a United States citizen, a resident of California, not in prison or on parole for the conviction of a felony, and will be at least 18 years of age at the time of the next election. This bill would require state and local juvenile detention facilities to identify individuals housed in those facilities who are of age to register to vote,  to assist those individuals with the completion of the voter registration card,  to provide  voter registration cards   affidavits of registration  to eligible voters,  to assist those individuals with the completion of the affidavits of registration,  and to transmit  the  completed voter registration cards to the county elections official  or to assist individuals in returning the completed cards to the county elections official  . By requiring local officials to perform additional duties, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2105.7 is added to the Elections Code, to read: 2105.7. (a) A state or local juvenile detention facility, including, but not limited to, a juvenile hall, juvenile ranch, juvenile camp, or a facility of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Division of Juvenile Justice, shall do all of the following: (1) Identify each individual housed in the facility who is of age to register to vote.  (2) Assist each individual identified pursuant to paragraph (1) with the completion of the voter registration card, unless the individual declines assistance.   (3)   (2)  Provide  a voter registration card   an affidavit of registration  to each individual housed in the facility who is of age to register to vote  .   by doing either of the following:   (A) Providing the individual a paper affidavit of registration.   (B) Directing the individual to an affidavit of registration provided on the Internet Web site of a county or the Secretary of State.   (3) Assist each individual housed in the facility who is of age to register to vote with the completion of the affidavit of registration, unless the individual declines assistance.   (4) Accept any completed voter registration cards and transmit the cards to the county elections official pursuant to the requirements of subdivision (b).  (b) A facility providing  voter registration cards   paper affidavits of registration  pursuant to subdivision (a) shall  transmit a completed card to the county elections official as follows   do either of the following  :  (1) Accept any completed voter registration card and transmit the card to the county elections official as follows:   (1)   (A)  Except as provided in  paragraph (2)   subparagraph (B)  , within 10 days of receipt from an individual housed in the facility.  (2)   (B)  Within five days of receipt from an individual housed in the facility, if the voter registration card was received within five days before the last day for registration to vote in an election.  (2) Assist the individual who completed the voter registration card in returning the completed card to the county elections official.   (c) A state or local juvenile detention facility is encouraged to work with the Secretary of State to achieve compliance with the requirements set forth in the federal National Voter Registration Act of 1993 (42 U.S.C. Sec. 1973gg et seq.) when providing voter registration services pursuant to subdivision (a).  SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code.