California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1063 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill May 12, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014