LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1063
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1063
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1063
Compare Versions
SB1063 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB1063 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB1063 Amended August 14, 2014
SB1063 Amended June 12, 2014
SB1063 Amended May 12, 2014
SB1063 Amended May 6, 2014
SB1063 Amended April 29, 2014
SB1063 Amended March 28, 2014
SB1063 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1063 Chaptered September 26, 2014
SB1063 Enrolled August 28, 2014
SB1063 Amended August 14, 2014
SB1063 Amended June 12, 2014
SB1063 Amended May 12, 2014
SB1063 Amended May 6, 2014
SB1063 Amended April 29, 2014
SB1063 Amended March 28, 2014
SB1063 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare