|
09/29/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4971.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 6666.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 6325.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6325.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Motion to reconsider continued to August 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 24. Page 6131.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 3655.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3309.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|