California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 13, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014