|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4644.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 6164.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3600.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3255.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|