California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014