|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 558, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4604.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6129.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3604.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3710.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Corrected March 26.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|