California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014