Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on NAT. RES.) suspended. (Page 5641.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 3669.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3710.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3295.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|