California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014