Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3697.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3710.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|