California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill April 30, 2014