|
08/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4297.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 5811.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 3438.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3403.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|