California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 24, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014