|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 577, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4991.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 16. Page 6708.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6380.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6344.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3711.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|