LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1182
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1182
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1182
Compare Versions
SB1182 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB1182 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB1182 Amended August 27, 2014
SB1182 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1182 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1182 Amended June 30, 2014
SB1182 Amended April 10, 2014
SB1182 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1182 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB1182 Enrolled September 3, 2014
SB1182 Amended August 27, 2014
SB1182 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1182 Amended August 18, 2014
SB1182 Amended June 30, 2014
SB1182 Amended April 10, 2014
SB1182 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare