|
09/20/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 518, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4640.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5705.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3118.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|