California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014