|
09/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 524, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4944.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 6556.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 3605.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3711.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3341.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3039.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|