LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1204
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1204
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1204
Compare Versions
SB1204 Chaptered September 21, 2014
SB1204 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB1204 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1204 Amended August 19, 2014
SB1204 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1204 Amended May 6, 2014
SB1204 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1204 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1204 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1204 Chaptered September 21, 2014
SB1204 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB1204 Amended August 22, 2014
SB1204 Amended August 19, 2014
SB1204 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1204 Amended May 6, 2014
SB1204 Amended April 21, 2014
SB1204 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1204 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare