|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 755, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4640.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6130.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3436.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3216.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|