California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014