|
07/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5815.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3693.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3311.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|