California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1222 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 18, 2014

Amended

Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 22, 2014