|
09/27/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 657, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4978.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6575.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6158.) Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6192.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3597.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|