California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill May 13, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014