|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 756, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4940.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6574.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and orded to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 6167.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5998.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3659.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3713.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3341.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|