California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 24, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014