|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 256, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4403.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3235.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3078.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|