California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014