|
07/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2014
|
Became law without Governor's signature.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4251.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5744.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 5702.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3655.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3713.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|