California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 30, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014