California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1273 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014