LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1273
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1273
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1273
Compare Versions
SB1273 Chaptered September 19, 2014
SB1273 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB1273 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1273 Amended June 30, 2014
SB1273 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1273 Amended April 22, 2014
SB1273 Amended April 2, 2014
SB1273 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1273 Chaptered September 19, 2014
SB1273 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB1273 Amended August 4, 2014
SB1273 Amended June 30, 2014
SB1273 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1273 Amended April 22, 2014
SB1273 Amended April 2, 2014
SB1273 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare