|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4716.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3037.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|