California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014