|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4474.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5965.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3594.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3162.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|