California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 22, 2014