|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 372, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4801.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6048.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 5722.) .
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3691.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3714.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 12.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3218.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|