California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1283 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014