Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2870.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 904.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 816.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 389.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|