California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB129 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill June 5, 2013
Bill April 30, 2013
Bill April 23, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013