|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6016.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5964.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3693.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|