LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1295
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1295
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1295
Compare Versions
SB1295 Chaptered September 16, 2014
SB1295 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB1295 Amended August 11, 2014
SB1295 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1295 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1295 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1295 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB1295 Chaptered September 16, 2014
SB1295 Enrolled August 19, 2014
SB1295 Amended August 11, 2014
SB1295 Amended June 18, 2014
SB1295 Amended May 27, 2014
SB1295 Amended March 24, 2014
SB1295 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare